Docket for 23-1135
|
Apr 15 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 20, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 20 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General to respond filed. | | Main Document | May 28 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2024. | | | May 31 2024 | Response Requested. (Due July 1, 2024) | | | Jun 03 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2024 to July 31, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jun 04 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 31, 2024. | | | Jul 31 2024 | Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 08 2024 | Reply of petitioners Saline Parents, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Aug 14 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024. | | | Oct 07 2024 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|