Docket for 23-1122
|
Apr 12 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 16, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 12 2024 | Application (23A925) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Apr 17 2024 | Response to application (23A925) requested by Justice Alito, due by 4 p.m. (EDT), on April 26, 2024. | | | Apr 26 2024 | Response to application from respondent Ken Paxton, Attorney General of Texas filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 29 2024 | Reply of applicant Free Speech Coalition, et al. filed. | | ReplyProof of Service | Apr 30 2024 | Application (23A925) referred to the Court. | | | Apr 30 2024 | Application (23A925) for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is denied. | | | May 07 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 16, 2024 to June 17, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 07 2024 | Response to motion to extend the time to file a response from petitioners filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 08 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 30, 2024. | | | May 16 2024 | Brief amici curiae of American Booksellers for Free Expression, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 16 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of International Centre for Missing and Exploited Children filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 16 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation and Woodhull Freedom Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 16 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 30 2024 | Brief of respondent Ken Paxton, Attorney General of Texas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 31 2024 | Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 04 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024. | | | Jun 04 2024 | Reply of petitioners Free Speech Coalition, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jun 28 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2024. | | |
|