Docket for 23-1095
|
Apr 05 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 9, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 01 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 9, 2024 to June 10, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 02 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 10, 2024. | | | May 17 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 10, 2024 to July 10, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 20 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 10, 2024. | | | Jul 10 2024 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 17 2024 | Reply of petitioner Patrick D. Thompson filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jul 24 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024. | | | Oct 04 2024 | Petition GRANTED. | | |
|