Docket for 23-1084
|
Jan 19 2024 | Application (23A683) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 4, 2024 to April 4, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions | Jan 24 2024 | Application (23A683) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 4, 2024. | | | Apr 04 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 8, 2024) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 25 2024 | Waiver of right of respondents State of Michigan, Gretchen E. Whitmer, Rachael Eubanks to respond filed. | | Main Document | Apr 30 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2024. | | | May 08 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 08 2024 | Brief amici curiae of EdChoice and Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 08 2024 | Brief amici curiae of West Virginia, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 08 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Manhattan Institute and Notre Dame Education Project filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 08 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty and The Buckeye Institute filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 08 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of The Foundation for Government Accountability filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 08 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Protect the First Foundation filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 13 2024 | Response Requested. (Due June 12, 2024) | | | May 15 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 12, 2024 to July 12, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 16 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 12, 2024. | | | Jul 12 2024 | Brief of respondents Michigan, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 30 2024 | Reply of petitioners Jill Hile, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jul 31 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024. | | | Oct 07 2024 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|