Docket for 22-897
|
Mar 14 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2023) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 14 2023 | Waiver of right of respondents John Doe 174, John Doe 176, John Doe 182, Jane Doe 183, John Doe 1, John Doe 195 and John Doe 162. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Apr 14 2023 | Waiver of right of respondents Edward Gonzales, et al., Rocky Ratliff, Eric Smith, et al., Michael Alf, et al., and Michael Canales, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Apr 25 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023. | | | May 02 2023 | Response Requested. (Due June 1, 2023) | | | May 08 2023 | Motion of Edward Gonzales, et al. to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2023 to July 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 08 2023 | Motion of John Doe 174, et al. to extend the time to file a response from June 1, 2023 to July 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 09 2023 | Response to motions to extend the time to file responses from petitioner The Ohio State University filed. | | Main Document | May 10 2023 | The motions to extend the time to file responses are denied. | | | Jun 01 2023 | Brief of respondents Edward Gonzales, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jun 02 2023 | Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner. | | Main Document | Jun 06 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023. | | | Jun 06 2023 | Reply of petitioner The Ohio State University filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jun 26 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|