Docket for 21A225
|
Dec 10 2021 | Application (21A225) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 14, 2021 to February 12, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Dec 15 2021 | Application (21A225) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 7, 2022. No further extensions of time shall be granted. See this Court's Rule 30. | | |
|