Docket for 21-829
|
Oct 07 2021 | Application (21A66) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 18, 2021 to December 2, 2021, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 12 2021 | Application (21A66) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 2, 2021. | | | Dec 02 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 3, 2022) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 17 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | Main Document | Dec 22 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022. | | | Jan 03 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Due Process Institute and National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 10 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|