SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-8016 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-8016 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
John Edward Burr, Petitioner
v.
Denise Jackson, Warden
Docketed:
June 1, 2022
Linked with 21A463
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(20-5)
Decision Date:
November 30, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
December 28, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 28 2022
Application (21A463) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 28, 2022 to May 27, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Mar 03 2022
Application (21A463) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 27, 2022.
May 26 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 1, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Jul 01 2022
Brief of respondent Denise Jackson, Warden in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jul 15 2022
Reply of petitioner John Edward Burr filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jul 21 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James P. Cooney III
Counsel of Record
Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP
301 S. College Street
Suite 3500
Charlotte, NC 28202
jim.cooney@wbd-us.com
704-331-4980
Party name: John Edward Burr
Attorneys for Respondent
Kimberly Nicole Callahan
Counsel of Record
North Carolina Department of Justice
114 West Edenton Street
Raleigh, NC 27603
kcallahan@ncdoj.gov
919-716-6592
Party name: Denise Jackson, Warden, Central Prison, Raleigh, NC
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##