Docket for 21-6472 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 19 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 3, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Dec 22 2021 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther | Jan 06 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022. | | | Jan 19 2022 | Reply of petitioner Anthony Mungin filed. (Distributed) | | Main Document | Jan 21 2022 | Certificate of Service of Anthony Mungin not accepted for filing.(corrected version submitted) (January 21, 2022) | | | Jan 21 2022 | Proof of service petitioner Anthony Mungin filed with respect to reply brief of petitioner Anthony Mungin. | | Main Document | Jan 24 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|