Docket for 21-1580
|
Apr 04 2022 | Application (21A584) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 20, 2022 to June 19, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Apr 06 2022 | Application (21A584) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 19, 2022. | | | Jun 17 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 22, 2022) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 10 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022. | | | Oct 03 2022 | Petition DENIED. Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|