Docket for 21-1155
|
Feb 17 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 24, 2022) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 11 2022 | Waiver of right of respondent Bureau of Alcohol, Firearms, Tobacco & Explosives, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 16 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022. | | | Apr 04 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|