Mar 31 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 17, 2021) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service |
May 12 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 17, 2021 to June 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
May 13 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 16, 2021. |
| |
May 17 2021 | Brief amici curiae of FAMM and The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Jun 07 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 16, 2021 to July 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jun 08 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 16, 2021. |
| |
Jul 07 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 16, 2021 to August 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jul 08 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 16, 2021. |
| |
Aug 10 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 16, 2021 to September 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Aug 11 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 15, 2021. |
| |
Sep 15 2021 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count |
Sep 29 2021 | Reply of petitioner Gerald Scott filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Sep 30 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021. |
| |
Oct 08 2021 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Gerald Scott filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Oct 18 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
| |