Jan 29 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2021) |
| PetitionProof of Service |
Feb 24 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 1, 2021 to March 31, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Feb 25 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 31, 2021. |
| |
Mar 16 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 31, 2021 to May 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 17 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 12, 2021. |
| |
May 12 2021 | Brief of respondent Miguel Angel Cano in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
May 12 2021 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Miguel Angel Cano. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Jun 01 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021. |
| |
Jun 01 2021 | Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed) |
| Proof of ServiceMain Document |
Jun 15 2021 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Jun 21 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021. |
| |
Jun 28 2021 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
| |
Jun 28 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
| |