Docket for 19A737
|
Jan 02 2020 | Application (19A737) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2020 to March 10, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jan 03 2020 | Application (19A737) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 10, 2020. | | | Mar 19 2020 | Waiver of Waverly Scott Kaffaga not accepted for filing. (March 19, 2020) | | |
|