Docket for 19-8814 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jun 22 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 27, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis | Jul 16 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 27, 2020 to August 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 17 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 26, 2020. | | | Aug 26 2020 | Brief of respondent Tommy Sharp, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Sep 09 2020 | Reply of petitioner Nicholas Alexander Davis filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Sep 10 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. | | | Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|