Nov 06 2019 | Application (19A514) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 24, 2019 to December 26, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther |
Nov 12 2019 | Application (19A514) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 26, 2019. |
| |
Dec 26 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 27, 2020) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jan 21 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 27, 2020 to February 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jan 22 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 26, 2020. |
| |
Jan 27 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Feb 13 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 26, 2020 to March 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Feb 14 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 27, 2020. |
| |
Mar 12 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 27, 2020 to May 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 13 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 14, 2020. |
| |
May 14 2020 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count |
May 19 2020 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from June 2, 2020 to June 9, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
May 20 2020 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until June 9, 2020, granted. |
| |
Jun 09 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020. |
| |
Jun 09 2020 | Reply of petitioner Tony Deshawn McCoy filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Jun 29 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
| |