Docket for 19-75
|
May 29 2019 | Application (18A1244) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 16, 2019 to July 17, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther | May 31 2019 | Application (18A1244) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until July 17, 2019. | | | Jul 15 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 14, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 25 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 14, 2019 to September 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 25 2019 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, James Garner. | | Blanket ConsentProof of Service | Jul 26 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 19, 2019. | | | Jul 29 2019 | Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Colorado. | | Blanket ConsentProof of Service | Aug 14 2019 | Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Law, Psychology, Neuroscience, and other Fields filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 14 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 19 2019 | Brief of respondent Colorado in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 25 2019 | Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner. | | Main Document | Oct 01 2019 | Reply of petitioner James Garner filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 02 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019. | | | Oct 21 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|