Docket for 19-607
|
Aug 12 2019 | Application (19A175) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 8, 2019 to November 7, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Main Document | Aug 16 2019 | Application (19A175) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until November 7, 2019. | | | Aug 21 2019 | Blanket Consent of Woodcrest Homes, Inc. not accepted for filing. (September 05, 2019) | | | Nov 07 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 12, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 12 2019 | Consent to the filing of amicus briefs received from counsel for Woodcrest Homes, Inc. not accepted for filing. (November 13, 2019 -- Corrected version to be submitted) | | | Nov 13 2019 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Woodcrest Homes, Inc. | | Blanket Consent | Nov 19 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 12, 2019 to February 10, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 21 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 10, 2020. | | | Dec 10 2019 | Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 10 2020 | Brief of respondent Carousel Farms Metropolitan District in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 24 2020 | Reply of petitioner Woodcrest Homes, Inc. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 26 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020. | | | Mar 23 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|