Oct 23 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2019) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Nov 19 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 29, 2019 to December 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Nov 21 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 30, 2019. |
| |
Dec 30 2019 | Brief of respondent Eric L. Beck in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther |
Dec 30 2019 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Eric L. Beck. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Jan 15 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020. |
| |
Feb 24 2020 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
| |
Feb 24 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
| |