Docket for 18-9170
|
Apr 30 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 7, 2019) | | PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisAppendixProof of Service | May 16 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent Josh Burson to respond filed. | | Main Document | May 16 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent Matthew Powell to respond filed. | | Main Document | May 20 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent David Roberson to respond filed. | | | May 21 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent Charles Perry to respond filed. | | | Jun 13 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. | | | Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|