SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-8844 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-8844 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Farris G. Morris, Petitioner
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:
April 16, 2019
Linked with 18A805
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-5626)
Decision Date:
November 13, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 01 2019
Application (18A805) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 11, 2019 to April 12, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Feb 08 2019
Application (18A805) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 12, 2019.
Apr 12 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 16, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
May 16 2019
Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Other
Jun 05 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 24 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard Tennent
Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
810 Broadway
Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37203
Richard_Tennent@fd.org
615-736-5047
Party name: Farris Genner Morris
Attorneys for Respondent
John Henry Bledsoe III
Counsel of Record
Office of Tennessee Attorney General
P. O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
John.Bledsoe@ag.tn.gov
6157414351
Party name: Tennessee
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##