SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-779
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-779
Title:
Power Integrations Inc., Petitioner
v.
Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., et al.
Docketed:
December 19, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Case Numbers:
(2016-2691, 2017-1875)
Decision Date:
September 20, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 19 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 18, 2019)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 18 2019
Brief of respondents Fairchild Semiconductor Int'l Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 06 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 06 2019
Reply of petitioner Power Integrations, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 25 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory George Garre
Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004
gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Power Integrations, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010
kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: Fairchild Semiconductor Int'l Inc., et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##