Docket for 18-744
|
Sep 25 2018 | Application (18A323) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 8, 2018 to December 7, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions | Sep 27 2018 | Application (18A323) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 7, 2018. | | | Dec 07 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 10, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 23 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019. | | | Feb 19 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|