SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-692
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-692
Title:
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
UCB, Inc., et al.
Docketed:
November 27, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Case Numbers:
(2016-2610, 2016-2683, 2016-2685, 2016-2698, 2016-2710, 2017-1001)
Decision Date:
May 23, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
August 24, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 21 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 27, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 17 2018
Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., et al..
Blanket Consent
Dec 21 2018
Brief amici curiae of R Street Institute and Public Knowledge filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 24 2018
Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Apotex Corp. and Apotex, Inc..
Blanket Consent
Dec 26 2018
Waiver of right of respondents UCB, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Dec 27 2018
Brief amicus curiae of Association for Accessible Medicine filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 27 2018
Brief amicus curiae of America’s Health Insurance Plans filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 09 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David Sidney Steuer
Counsel of Record
Wilson, Sonsini, et al.
650 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050
dsteuer@wsgr.com
650-320-4855
Party name: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ian Scott
Counsel of Record
Taft Stettinius & Hollister, LLP
111 East Wacker, Suite 2800
Chicago, IL 60601
iscott@taftlaw.com
312-527-4000
Party name: Apotex Corp. and Apotex, Inc.
Adam R. Gahtan
Fenwick & West, LLP
902 Broadway, Suite 14
New York, NY 10010
agahtan@fenwick.com
212-430-2600
Party name: UCB, Inc., et al.
Other
Charles Duan
Counsel of Record
R Street Institute
1212 New York Ave NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005
supremecourt.gov@cduan.com
202-861-0020
Party name: R Street Institute and Public Knowledge
Richard Jerold Hoskins
Counsel of Record
Schiff Hardin LLP
233 S Wacker Drive
Suite 7100
Chicago, IL 60606
rhoskins@schiffhardin.com
312-258-5509
Party name: Association for Accessible Medicine
Anna-Rose Mathieson
Counsel of Record
California Appellate Law Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105
annarose.mathieson@calapplaw.com
4156496700
Party name: America’s Health Insurance Plans
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##