Docket for 18-6882 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 11 2018 | Application (18A49) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 3, 2018 to December 2, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | Jul 16 2018 | Application (18A49) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 2, 2018. | | | Nov 28 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 31, 2018) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Dec 20 2018 | Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | Jan 03 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019. | | | Jan 22 2019 | Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari: I dissent for the reasons set out in Reynolds v. Florida, 586 U. S. ___ (2018) (Sotomayor, J., dissenting). | | |
|