Docket for 18-648
|
Oct 01 2018 | Application (18A379) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 15, 2018 to November 15, 2018, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Oct 10 2018 | Application (18A379) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until November 14, 2018. | | | Nov 14 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 19, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 19 2018 | Waiver of James Dean, et al. of right to respond not accepted for filing. (December 20, 2018) | | | Dec 20 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent Debra Shelden to respond filed. | | Main Document | Dec 20 2018 | Waiver of right of respondents Lois White, Personal Represenative for the Estate of Joseph White, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Dec 21 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent James Dean to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 02 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019. | | | Jan 09 2019 | Response Requested. (Due February 8, 2019) | | | Jan 30 2019 | Brief of respondents James L. Dean, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 13 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019. | | | Feb 14 2019 | Reply of County of Gage, et al. not accepted for filing. (February 14, 2019) (Corrected version submitted) | | | Feb 14 2019 | Reply of petitioners County of Gage, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 04 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|