Oct 03 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 2, 2018) |
| PetitionCertificate of Word Count |
Oct 16 2018 | Letter of October 16, 2018 from the Solicitor General filed. |
| Main Document |
Oct 22 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 2, 2018 to December 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Oct 25 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 3, 2018. |
| |
Nov 01 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 2, 2018 to December 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Nov 05 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 3, 2018. |
| |
Nov 30 2018 | Brief of respondent Andre Levon Glover in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Nov 30 2018 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Andre Levon Glover. |
| Main Document |
Nov 30 2018 | Brief of respondent Maurice Lamont Davis in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Dec 03 2018 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Maurice Lamont Davis. |
| Main Document |
Dec 19 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019. |
| |
Dec 19 2018 | Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed) |
| Proof of ServiceMain Document |
Jan 04 2019 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Maurice Lamont Davis GRANTED. |
| |
Jan 04 2019 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Andre Levon Glover GRANTED. |
| |
Jan 04 2019 | Petition GRANTED. |
| |
Jan 29 2019 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner United States. |
| Proof of ServiceMain Document |
Feb 11 2019 | SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, April 17, 2019 |
| |
Feb 12 2019 | Brief of petitioner United States filed. |
| Proof of ServiceMain Document |
Feb 19 2019 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED. |
| |
Mar 14 2019 | Brief of Maurice Lamont Davis, et al. not accepted for filing. (Corrected brief submitted.) (March 18, 2019) |
| |
Mar 14 2019 | Brief of respondents Maurice Lamont Davis, et al. filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Mar 20 2019 | CIRCULATED |
| |
Mar 21 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Mar 21 2019 | Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit. |
| |
Mar 21 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of FAMM filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Mar 21 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Apr 05 2019 | Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed) |
| Certificate of Word CountMain Document |
Apr 05 2019 | Motion to appoint counsel filed by respondent Andre Levon Glover. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Apr 17 2019 | Argued. For petitioner: Eric J. Feigin, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Brandon E. Beck, Assistant Federal Public Defender, Lubbock, Tex. |
| |
Apr 17 2019 | Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019. |
| |
May 13 2019 | Motion to appoint counsel GRANTED, and J. Joseph Mongaras, Esq., of Dallas, Texas, is appointed to serve as counsel for respondent Andre L. Glover. |
| |
Jun 24 2019 | Adjudged to be AFFIRMED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, and case REMANDED. Gorsuch, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Ginsburg, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Kavanaugh, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Thomas and Alito, JJ., joined, and in which Roberts, C. J., joined as to all but Part II–C. |
| |
Jul 26 2019 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
| |