Docket for 18-189
|
Jun 28 2018 | Application (18A8) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 10, 2018 to August 9, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jul 05 2018 | Application (18A8) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 9, 2018. | | | Aug 09 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 13, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 21 2018 | Waiver of right of Francisco, Noel J. United States to respond filed. | | Main Document | Aug 22 2018 | Brief of respondents Apple Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 22 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent Google, LLC to respond filed. | | Main Document | Sep 05 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. | | | Sep 05 2018 | Reply of petitioner Smartflash LLC filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 01 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|