Docket for 18-1240
|
Jan 10 2019 | Application (18A726) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 20, 2019 to February 20, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions | Jan 14 2019 | Application (18A726) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 20, 2019. | | | Feb 08 2019 | Application (18A726) to extend further the time from February 20, 2019 to March 21, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Written RequestProof of Service | Feb 12 2019 | Application (18A726) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 21, 2019. | | | Mar 21 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 24, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 02 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent District of Columbia to respond filed. | | Main Document | Apr 09 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority to respond filed. | | Main Document | Apr 24 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Apr 24 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 30 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019. | | | May 07 2019 | Response Requested. (Due June 6, 2019) | | | May 29 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 6, 2019 to July 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 31 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 8, 2019, for all respondents. | | | Jun 27 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 8, 2019 to July 31, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jun 28 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 31, 2019, for all respondents. | | | Jul 29 2019 | Brief of respondents Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority. et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 31 2019 | Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 14 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. | | | Aug 14 2019 | Reply of petitioners Phil Kerpen, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|