Docket for 18-1185
|
Mar 08 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 12, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 10 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. VIDED. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 12 2019 | Brief of respondents National Association of African American-Owned Media, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 29 2019 | Reply of petitioner Charter Communications, Inc. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 30 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019. | | | May 15 2019 | Rescheduled. | | | May 20 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019. | | | May 28 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019. | | | Jun 03 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019. | | | Mar 23 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020. | | | Mar 30 2020 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Comcast Corp. v. National Assn. of African American-Owned Media, 589 U. S. ___ (2020). The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | | May 01 2020 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|