Docket for 18-1073
|
Feb 11 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 18, 2019) | | PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 21 2019 | Waiver of right of respondents Governer of New Jersey, Chris Christie, Eric T. Kanefsky, Milagros Collazo, J. Michael Walker, and Paul Jordan to respond filed. | | Main Document | Feb 26 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent Garden State Equality to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 20 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019. | | | Apr 15 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|