Docket for 17-707
|
Nov 03 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2017) | | | Dec 27 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018. | | | Jan 03 2018 | Response Requested. (Due February 2, 2018) | | | Jan 17 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 2, 2018 to March 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 19 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 5, 2018, for all respondents. | | | Mar 05 2018 | Brief of respondents Oracle Corporation, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 21 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018. | | | Apr 24 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018. | | | Apr 30 2018 | Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|