Docket for 17-7062 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 25 2017 | Application (17A358) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 5, 2017 to December 4, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Application (17A358) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until December 4, 2017. | | | Dec 04 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 11, 2018) | | PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | Jan 11 2018 | Brief of respondent State of Oklahoma in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 25 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018. | | | Feb 20 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|