Docket for 17-697
|
Aug 29 2017 | Application (17A234) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 10, 2017 to November 9, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | | Sep 06 2017 | Application (17A234) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 9, 2017. | | | Nov 09 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 11, 2017) | | | Dec 06 2017 | Brief of respondent Apple Inc. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 20 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. | | | Dec 20 2017 | Reply of petitioners Smartflash LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 08 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|