Docket for 17-663
|
Oct 27 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2017) | | | Nov 29 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2017 to January 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 29 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 3, 2018. | | | Dec 21 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 3, 2018 to February 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 21 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 2, 2018 | | | Feb 02 2018 | Brief of respondents United States in opposition filed. | | Proof of ServiceMain Document | Feb 15 2018 | Reply of petitioners Green Solution Retail, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count | Feb 21 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018. | | | Mar 19 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|