Docket for 17-609
|
Aug 09 2017 | Application (17A170) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 22, 2017 to September 21, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | | Aug 16 2017 | Application (17A170) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 21, 2017. | | | Sep 11 2017 | Application (17A170) to extend further the time from September 21, 2017 to October 21, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | | Sep 15 2017 | Application (17A170) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 21, 2017. | | | Oct 23 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 24, 2017) | | | Oct 31 2017 | Waiver of right of respondents Sprint Nextel Corporation, et al. to respond filed. | | | Nov 08 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017. | | | Nov 09 2017 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. | | | Nov 10 2017 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by U.S. Inventors Group. (Distributed) | | | Nov 15 2017 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 15 2017 | Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Sprint Nextel Corporation, et al. to filing of the U.S. Inventor and Eagle Forum briefs. | | Blanket Consent | Nov 24 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Raymond A. Mercado, Ph.D., RPost Communications Limited, RPost Holdings, Inc., RPost International Limited, RMail Limited filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Dec 04 2017 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by U.S. Inventors Group GRANTED. | | | Dec 04 2017 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund GRANTED. | | | Dec 04 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|