Docket for 17-430
|
Jul 27 2017 | Application (17A84) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 6, 2017 to September 21, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | | Aug 02 2017 | Application (17A84) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 21, 2017. | | | Sep 21 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 23, 2017) | | | Oct 06 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Prism Technologies LLC to respond filed. | | | Oct 18 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2017. | | | Nov 06 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|