Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-422
RSS Feed Print Notify MeSearch documents in this case:
No. 17-422
Title:ETC Marketing, Ltd., Petitioner
v.
Harris County Appraisal District
Docketed:September 20, 2017
Linked with 17A94
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Texas
   Case Numbers:(15-0687)
   Decision Date:April 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 17 2017Application (17A94) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 27, 2017 to September 25, 2017, submitted to Justice Alito.
Jul 24 2017Application (17A94) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 28, 2017.
Aug 10 2017Application (17A94) to extend further the time from August 28, 2017 to September 18, 2017, submitted to Justice Alito.
Aug 11 2017Application (17A94) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 18, 2017.
Sep 18 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 20, 2017)
Oct 12 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2017.
Oct 17 2017Brief amicus curiae of Texas Pipeline Association filed.
Oct 20 2017Brief amici curiae of Plains Marketing, L.P. and National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Nov 10 2017Brief of respondent Harris County Appraisal District in opposition filed.
Nov 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.
Nov 20 2017Reply of petitioner ETC Marketing, Ltd. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

Gregory.Garre@lw.com
(202) 637-2207
Party name: ETC Marketing, Ltd.
Attorneys for Respondent
Mario L. Dell'Osso
    Counsel of Record
Olson & Olson, L.L.P.
Wortham Tower, Suite 600, 2727 Allen Parkway, Suite 600
Houston, TX 77019

jdellosso@sbcglobal.net
713-533-3800
Party name: Harris County Appraisal District
Eric Clayton FarrarOlson & Olson
2727 Allen Parkway #600
Houston, TX 77019-2133

efarrar@olsonllp.com
713-533-3800
Party name: Harris County Appraisal District
Other
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins, LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Suite 500 - West
Washington, DC 20037

jelwood@velaw.com
202-639-6500
Party name: Plains Marketing, L.P. and National Association of Manufacturers
Marnie A. McCormick
    Counsel of Record
Duggins Wren Mann & Romero LLP
P.O. Box 1149
Austin, TX 78767-1149

mmccormick@dwmrlaw.com
512 744 9300
Party name: Texas Pipeline Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543