Docket for 17-372
|
Jul 27 2017 | Application (17A131) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 10, 2017 to September 11, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | | Jul 31 2017 | Application (17A131) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 11, 2017. | | | Sep 11 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2017) | | | Sep 26 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2017. | | | Oct 31 2017 | Brief of respondents Bayer CropScience AG, et al. in opposition filed. | | | Nov 13 2017 | Reply of petitioners Dow AgroSciences, LLC, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 14 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017. | | | Dec 04 2017 | Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|