Docket for 17-330
|
Aug 28 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 2, 2017) | | | Oct 02 2017 | Waiver of right of respondents Travelers Lloyds of Texas Insurance, et al. to respond filed. | | | Oct 04 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017. | | | Oct 10 2017 | Response Requested. (Due November 9, 2017) | | | Nov 03 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 11, 2017. | | | Dec 11 2017 | Brief of respondents Travelers Lloyds of Texas Insurance, et al. in opposition filed. | | Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document | Dec 27 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018. | | | Apr 24 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018. | | | Apr 30 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|