Docket for 17-307
|
Aug 24 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 28, 2017) | | | Sep 19 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2017. | | | Oct 26 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 27, 2017. | | | Nov 06 2017 | Waiver of right of petitioners South Carolina Department of Corrections, et al. to respond filed. VIDED. | | | Nov 21 2017 | Brief of respondent Patrick L. Booker in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 06 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. | | | Jan 04 2018 | Rescheduled. | | | Jan 08 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018. | | | Jan 16 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|