SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-1519
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-1519
Title:
Homes for America, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Sunoco Pipeline, L.P.
Docketed:
May 8, 2018
Lower Ct:
Commonwealth Court of Pennsylvania
Case Numbers:
(565 CD 2016)
Decision Date:
May 24, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
January 22, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 20 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 7, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 08 2018
Waiver of right of respondent Sunoco Pipeline, L.P. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 15 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
Jun 04 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Francis Faherty
Counsel of Record
75 Cedar Avenue
Hershey, PA 17033
mfaherty@fahertylawfirm.com
(717) 256-3000
Party name: Homes for America
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert L. Byer
Counsel of Record
Duane Morris LLP
600 Grant ST
Suite 5010
Pittsburgh, PA 15219
rlbyer@duanemorris.com
4124971083
Party name: Sunoco Pipeline, L.P.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##