Docket for 17-1137
|
Feb 09 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 15, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 16 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent SteadyMed Ltd. to respond filed. | | | Feb 28 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018. | | | Mar 07 2018 | Response Requested. (Due April 6, 2018) | | | Apr 05 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 6, 2018 to May 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 06 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 7, 2018 | | | Apr 27 2018 | Stipulation to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46.1 filed. | | Main Document | Jun 04 2018 | Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. | | |
|