Docket for 17-1009
|
Jan 16 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 20, 2018) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 30 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 20, 2018 to March 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 06 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 22, 2018, for all respondents. | | | Feb 20 2018 | Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 14 2018 | Brief of respondents New York State Respondents in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 22 2018 | Brief of intervenors respondents Catskill Mountainkeeper, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 09 2018 | Reply of petitioner Constitution Pipeline Company, LLC filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 11 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018. | | | Apr 30 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|