Docket for 16-9672
 | | No. 16-9672
| Title: | C.D., E.F., and G.H., Petitioners v. United States | Docketed: | June 22, 2017 | | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit | Case Numbers: | (15-3318, 16-3024, 16-3033) | Decision Date: | February 22, 2017 | Rehearing Denied: | March 22, 2017 | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | Analyst: | | Questions Presented |
|
Jun 20 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 24, 2017) | | | Jul 20 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 23, 2017. | | | Aug 14 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 22, 2017. | | | Sep 21 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 23, 2017. | | | Oct 23 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | | Nov 06 2017 | Reply of petitioner C.D., et al. filed. (Distributed) | | | Nov 09 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017. | | | Dec 04 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017. | | | Jun 04 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018. | | | Jun 11 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|