Docket for 16-9607 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Apr 06 2017 | Application (16A967) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 17, 2017 to June 16, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | | Apr 12 2017 | Application (16A967) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until June 16, 2017. | | | Jun 16 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 20, 2017) | | | Jul 19 2017 | Brief of respondent Terry Royal, Warden in opposition filed. | | | Aug 02 2017 | Reply of petitioner Richard Rojem filed. (Distributed) | | | Aug 03 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|