Docket for 16-790
|
Dec 16 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 23, 2017) | | | Jan 18 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 22, 2017. | | | Feb 16 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 24, 2017. | | | Mar 17 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 24, 2017. | | | Apr 14 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 24, 2017. | | | May 24 2017 | Brief of respondent Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General in opposition filed. | | | Jun 14 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Jul 07 2017 | Reply of petitioner Kap Sun Butka filed. (Distributed) | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|