Docket for 16-1394
|
May 19 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 22, 2017) | | | May 24 2017 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the Petitioners. | | | Jun 08 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 24, 2017. | | | Jun 22 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. | | | Jun 22 2017 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Association for the Treatment of Sexual Abusers. | | | Jun 22 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. | | | Jun 22 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Criminology Scholars and The Fair Punishment Project filed. | | | Jul 18 2017 | Brief of respondents Emily Johnson Piper, et al. in opposition filed. | | | Jul 28 2017 | Reply of petitioners Kevin S.Karsjens, et al. filed. | | | Aug 02 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Association for the Treatment of Sexual Abusers GRANTED. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|