Docket for 16-1370
|
May 11 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 15, 2017) | | | Jun 08 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 17, 2017. | | | Jul 07 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 16, 2017. | | | Aug 08 2017 | Supplemental brief of petitioner MasTec Advanced Technologies, a Division of MasTec, Inc. filed. | | | Aug 16 2017 | Brief of respondent National Labor Relations Board in opposition filed. | | | Aug 30 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|