Docket for 16-1298
|
Apr 25 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 30, 2017) | | | May 04 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | | May 09 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017. | | | May 16 2017 | Response Requested. (Due June 15, 2017) | | | Jun 08 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 17, 2017. | | | Jul 13 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 17, 2017. | | | Aug 17 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | | Sep 06 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|